Reports for Nottaris AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nottaris AG
- Nottaris AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Oberburg. Nottaris AG belongs to the industry «Foundry operation» and is currently active.
- Nottaris AG has 6 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 09.12.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Nottaris AG is registered under the UID CHE-114.394.326.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Nottaris Bauguss AG, Nottaris Holding AG, Nottaris Immobilien AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Liechti,
Anita Nottaris,
Patrick Nottaris,
François Nottaris,
Markus Sturzenegger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.042.410-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.394.326
CHE-230.956.944 VAT
Sector
Foundry operation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Giesserei, einer Modellbau- und mechanischen Werkstätte sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke und Immobilien erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt und indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidatio Treuhand AG | Steffisburg | 25.08.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
B&N Treuhand GmbH | Steffisburg | 04.07.2008 | 24.08.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nottaris AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005624338, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris AG, in Oberburg, CHE-114.394.326, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 18.01.2021, Publ. 1005075977).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Liechti, Thomas, von Signau, in Rüegsauschachen (Rüegsau), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005075977, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris AG, in Oberburg, CHE-114.394.326, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2020, Publ. 1004964070).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Thiemann, Günter Norbert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Langendorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nottaris, Anita, von Onsernone, in Châtillon FR, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004964070, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris AG, in Oberburg, CHE-114.394.326, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 23.05.2018, Publ. 4243039).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
B&N Treuhand AG (CHE-106.349.890), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nottaris, Patrick, von Onsernone, in Châtillon FR, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Isorno];
Nottaris-Meissner, Helga, von Onsernone, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Isorno];
Fidatio Treuhand AG (CHE-438.556.383), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle;
Nottaris, François, von Onsernone, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Isorno].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.