Reports for Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei
- Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Zollikofen. Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei belongs to the industry «Production and processing of wooden goods» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei, which was founded on the 09.12.2003, consists of 7 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.10.2022.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-110.340.366.
Management (7)
newest board members
Giorgio Albisetti,
Daniel Rutsch,
Frank Schürmann,
Rudolf Sahli jun.
newest authorized signatories
Giorgio Albisetti,
Christian von Aesch,
Stephan Niederberger,
Walter Menato,
Daniel Rutsch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zollikofen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.032.585-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.340.366
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Schreinerei und Fensterfabrik; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 17.10.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | 26.06.2008 | 16.10.2022 | |
H. U. Gerber Treuhand AG | Mühleberg | <2004 | 25.06.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schreinerei und Fensterfabrik Muesmatt AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005584273, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei, in Zollikofen, CHE-110.340.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 27.10.2020, Publ. 1005008699).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hesselbach, Jochen Henrik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Graffenried AG Treuhand (CHE-103.633.774), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Albisetti, Giorgio, von Bern und Balerna, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
T + R AG (CHE-105.857.623), in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005008699, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei, in Zollikofen, CHE-110.340.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2018, Publ. 1004525976).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schürmann, Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Vlotho (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sahli, Rudolf 1956, von Frauenkappelen, in Frauenkappelen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hesselbach, Jochen Henrik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rutsch, Daniel, von Bern und Rapperswil (BE), in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Menato, Walter, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zollikofen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem weiteren Prokuristen;
Niederberger, Stephan, von Dallenwil, in Schnottwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem weiteren Prokuristen;
von Aesch, Christian, von Grossaffoltern, in Jens, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem weiteren Prokuristen.
Publication number: HR02-1004525976, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Muesmatt AG Fenster und Schreinerei, in Zollikofen, CHE-110.340.366, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2017, Publ. 3906919).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dörlitz, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.