Reports for Müller + Fritz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Müller + Fritz AG
- Müller + Fritz AG is active in the industry «Trading in agricultural products and livestock» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Brütten.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.12.2019. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-103.976.607.
Management (4)
newest board members
Katharina Barbara Fritz,
Christian Fritz,
Martin Müller,
Urs Müller
newest authorized signatories
Katharina Barbara Fritz,
Christian Fritz,
Martin Müller,
Urs Müller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brütten
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.918.301-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.976.607
Sector
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion von und Handel mit Schnittblumen und Topfpflanzen. Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmungen mit ähnlicher Zwecksetzung beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Winco Treuhand AG | Winterthur | 19.12.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mora Treuhandberatung GmbH | Winterthur | 24.11.2009 | 18.12.2019 | |
Fäsi GmbH in Liquidation | Brütten | <2004 | 23.11.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Müller + Fritz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004787476, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Müller + Fritz AG, in Brütten, CHE-103.976.607, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1631591).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fritz, Jean, von Winterthur, in Brütten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mora Treuhandberatung GmbH (CHE-107.595.055), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fritz, Katharina Barbara, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Winco Treuhand AG (CHE-354.886.915), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1631591, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Müller + Fritz AG, in Brütten, CHE-103.976.607, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 24.11.2009, S. 28, Publ. 5356862).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller-Bachmann, Margrit, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mora Treuhandberatung GmbH (CHE-107.595.055), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Mora Treuhandberatung GmbH (CH-020.4.018.395-4)];
Fritz, Christian, von Winterthur, in Brütten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Urs, von Winterthur, in Neftenbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Martin, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5356862, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Müller + Fritz AG, in Brütten, CH-020.3.918.301-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.1998, S. 5300).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fäsi GmbH, in Brütten, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mora Treuhandberatung GmbH (CH-020.4.018.395-4), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.