Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung
Bernstrasse 4
4562 Biberist
Reports for Moos-Flury-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Moos-Flury-Stiftung
- Moos-Flury-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Biberist, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Moos-Flury-Stiftung consists of 4 persons.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.04.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Moos-Flury-Stiftung is registered in the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-110.382.057.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.03.1968
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Biberist
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-251.7.000.010-2
UID/VAT
CHE-110.382.057
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Kunstsammlung als Ganzes zu erhalten und diese in geeigneter Form der Öffentlichkeit zugänglich zu machen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Villiger Treuhand AG | Biberist | 23.04.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Biber Treuhand AG | Biberist | 26.01.2009 | 22.04.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Moos-Flury-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004614815, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Moos-Flury-Stiftung, in Biberist, CHE-110.382.057, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 05.02.2019, Publ. 1004558765).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biber Treuhand AG, in Biberist (CH-251.3.000.350-5), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Villiger Treuhand AG (CHE-106.931.736), in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004558765, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Moos-Flury-Stiftung, in Biberist, CHE-110.382.057, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 26.01.2009, Publ. 4845522).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Stiftungsaufsicht Solothurn, in Solothurn.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Blaser, Martin, von Steinen, in Biberist, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jud-Steiner, Elsbeth, von Schänis, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hug-Portmann, Stefan, von Herbetswil, in Biberist, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Baumann-Jud, Eva, von Oberentfelden, in Biberist, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4845522, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Moos-Flury-Stiftung, in Biberist, CH-251.7.000.010-2, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2007, S. 13, Publ. 3901084).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofer, Werner, von Nennigkofen, in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Biber Treuhand AG, in Biberist (CH-251.3.000.350-5), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.