Reports for mikas AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout mikas AG
- mikas AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production of comestibles».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 08.12.2011.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.06.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-148.225.733.
- The IPI database currently contains 23 trademarks or applications for the company mikas AG.
- Next to the company mikas AG there are 11 other active companies with an identical address. These include: 3D-EDU GmbH, Büro 146, Valentin Hindermann, Madeleine Stahel, Maike Hamacher, Epro AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Balthasar Alois Joseph Wicki,
Luciano Gabriele Marinello,
Mika Martin Lanz
newest authorized signatories
Balthasar Alois Joseph Wicki,
Luciano Gabriele Marinello,
Mika Martin Lanz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.12.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.046.389-9
UID/VAT
CHE-148.225.733
Sector
Production of comestibles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, die Produktion und die Verarbeitung hochwertiger Lebensmittel und Getränke sowie deren Vertrieb und Handel. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Haussmann Revision AG | Zürich | 05.12.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Morf Treuhand AG | Uster | 12.07.2017 | 04.12.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- mikas SA
- mikas Ltd.
- mikas GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
JUJU | - | pending application | 11833/2024 |
Juuzy | 09.02.2024 | active | 12631/2023 |
Newest SOGC notifications: mikas AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006069577, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
mikas AG, in Zürich, CHE-148.225.733, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 04.01.2021, Publ. 1005063087).
Domizil neu:
Albulastrasse 24, 8048 Zürich.
Publication number: HR02-1005063087, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
mikas AG, in Zürich, CHE-148.225.733, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 06.09.2018, Publ. 1004449959).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bär, René Julius, von Zürich, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zumbühl, Moritz Lukas Pedro, von Aarau, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marinello, Luciano Gabriele, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wicki, Balthasar Alois Joseph, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004449959, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
mikas AG, in Zürich, CHE-148.225.733, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2017, Publ. 3909599).
Domizil neu:
Friedheimstrasse 4a, 8057 Zürich.