Reports for Metaba AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Metaba AG
- Metaba AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Endingen. Metaba AG belongs to the industry «Production of metal goods» and is currently active.
- Metaba AG was founded on 01.05.1961.
- On the 01.03.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-101.552.337.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.05.1961
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Endingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.915.037-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.552.337
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Projektierung und Ausführung von Stahl- und Metallbauten aller Art, sodann Halten und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften und Anteilen daran sowie von Beteiligungen an anderen Gesellschaften; die Gesellschaft kann Finanzgeschäfte aller Art vornehmen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
audax ag | Zurzach | 23.12.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AS & T Attenhofer Steuerberatung & Treuhand | Zurzach | 01.09.2008 | 22.12.2015 | |
Edelmann Treuhand + Verwaltungen | Bad Zurzach | <2004 | 31.08.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Metall- und Stahlbau AG Endingen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Metaba AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005417148, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metaba AG, in Endingen, CHE-101.552.337, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2021, Publ. 1005301249). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2022].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
audax ag (CHE-113.993.286), in Zurzach, Revisionsstelle [bisher: in Bad Zurzach].
Publication number: HR02-1005301249, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metaba AG, in Endingen, CHE-101.552.337, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2018, Publ. 4308733).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spuler, Esther, von Weisslingen, in Neerach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spuler, David, von Endingen, in Neerach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4308733, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metaba AG, in Endingen, CHE-101.552.337, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 23.12.2015, Publ. 2560727).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spuler, Thomas, von Endingen, in Dielsdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ackeret, Jacques, von Seuzach und Winterthur, in Ehrendingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Spuler, Esther, von Weisslingen, in Neerach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.