Address
c/o Merse Immobiliers SA
Rue de l'Hôpital 12
2502 Biel/Bienne
Reports for Merse Immobiliers A SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Merse Immobiliers A SA
- Merse Immobiliers A SA with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Merse Immobiliers A SA is active.
- The management of the company Merse Immobiliers A SA consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 15.06.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-113.661.884.
- On the same address there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: Eleser SA, Fondation Serge Mérillat, MATBAT Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.06.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.017.928-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.661.884
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition, vente et gestion continue d'immeubles et d'appartements, pour son compte ou pour le compte de tiers. La société peut accorder des prêts à ses actionnaires ou à des tiers, se porter caution d'emprunts souscrits par ses actionnaires ou des tiers, fournir des garanties pour ces emprunts par l'émission ou le nantissement de titres hypothécaires ou par la souscription de tout autre engagement financier, mettre ses biens en gage pour garantir toute créance. Elle peut, en plus, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAG Jura SA | Delémont | 28.11.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 12.08.2009 | 27.11.2019 | |
C.M. Management Services S.A. | Soyhières | 07.06.2007 | 11.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Merse Immobiliers A SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005495830, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Merse Immobiliers A SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-113.661.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 231 du 28.11.2019, Publ. 1004769811).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Hadorn, Sébastien, de Toffen, à Sonceboz-Sombeval, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Mérillat, Sébastien, de Perrefitte, à Evilard, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Biel/Bienne, président, avec signature individuelle];
Mérillat, Stéphanie, de Perrefitte, à Biel/Bienne, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administratrice, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1004769811, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Merse Immobiliers A SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-113.661.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 82 du 28.04.2017, Publ. 3491693).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Audit Transjurane SA (CHE-102.252.151), à Delémont, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
FIDAG Jura SA (CHE-105.190.411), à Delémont, organe de révision.
Publication number: 3491693, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Merse Immobiliers A SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-113.661.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 7 du 11.01.2017, Publ. 3275673).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Hadorn, Sébastien, de Toffen, à Sonceboz-Sombeval, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
de Vevey, Aline, de La Sagne, à Praz (Vully) (Mont-Vully), avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.