Address
c/o Einwohnergemeinde Biberist, Gemeindeverwaltung
Bernstrasse 4, Gemeindeverwaltung
4562 Biberist
Reports for Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung
- Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Biberist and is active. It operates in the sector «Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising».
- The management of the organization Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung, which was founded on the 14.03.2007, consists of 4 persons.
- On the 23.04.2019 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-113.504.776.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.03.2007
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Biberist
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.7.006.502-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.504.776
Sector
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die von den Ehegatten Juillerat-Dietler übernommenen Bilder im Andenken an die Donatoren in den öffentlichen Gebäuden der Einwohnergemeinde Biberist auszustellen, vor allem in der Alterssiedlung Egelmoos und im Alters- und Pflegeheim Bleichematt 'Läbesgarte', in gewissen Zeitabständen Ausstellungen 'in memoriam Max Juillerat' zu organisieren sowohl in Biberist wie generell an Orten, wo solche willkommen sind. Bezweckt ferner, Bilder aus dem Stiftungsvermögen zu veräussern an kunstverbundene Dritte, die nicht spekulative Ziele verfolgen, zur Linderung nicht voraussehbarer finanzieller Notsituationen der Alterssiedlung Egelmoos wie auch des Alters- und Pflegeheimes Bleichematt 'Läbesgarte', ferner an die Einwohnergemeinde Biberist, auf deren Begehren aus besonderem Anlass, damit sie die Gegenstände als Ehrengaben des Gemeinwesens widmen kann.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Villiger Treuhand AG | Biberist | 23.04.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Biber Treuhand AG | Biberist | 26.01.2009 | 22.04.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004614814, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung, in Biberist, CHE-113.504.776, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 05.02.2019, Publ. 1004558764).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biber Treuhand AG, in Biberist (CH-251.3.000.350-5), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Villiger Treuhand AG (CHE-106.931.736), in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004558764, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung, in Biberist, CHE-113.504.776, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 26.01.2009, Publ. 4845064).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Stiftungsaufsicht Solothurn, in Solothurn.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Blaser, Martin, von Steinen, in Biberist, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jud-Steiner, Elsbeth, von Schänis, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hug-Portmann, Stefan, von Herbetswil, in Biberist, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Baumann-Jud, Eva, von Oberentfelden, in Biberist, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4845064, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Max und Margaritha Juillerat-Stiftung, in Biberist, CH-241.7.006.502-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 11.04.2007, S. 15, Publ. 3878822).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofer, Werner, von Nennigkofen, in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Biber Treuhand AG, in Biberist (CH-251.3.000.350-5), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.