Address
c/o Andrew Magerman
Im Marbach 53
8800 Thalwil
Reports for Magerman GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Magerman GmbH
- Magerman GmbH with its legal headquarters in Thalwil is active. Magerman GmbH operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management has one active person registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 20.04.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-113.887.106.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.10.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Thalwil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.036.468-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.887.106
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungs- und anderen Dienstleistungen im EDV-Bereich, Entwicklung und Verkauf von Softwareprodukten sowie Ausbildung im Informatikbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen, die geeignet sind, den Gesellschaftsgegenstand zu fördern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Magerman GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005453781, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Magerman GmbH, in Thalwil, CHE-113.887.106, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 20.10.2009, S.25, Publ. 5301596).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Magerman, André, von Maienfeld, in Thalwil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Magerman, Andrew, britischer Staatsangehöriger].
Publication number: 5301596, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Magerman GmbH, in Thalwil, CH-020.4.036.468-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.2008, S. 39, Publ. 4786990).
Domizil neu:
c/o Andrew Magerman, Im Marbach 53, 8800 Thalwil.
Publication number: 4786990, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Magerman GmbH, in Thalwil, CH-020.4.036.468-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 210 vom 30.10.2007, S. 20, Publ. 4176588).
Statutenänderung:
08.12.2008.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführer vom 08.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Fritz, von Thalwil, in Thalwil, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Magerman, Andrew, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Thalwil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00].