Reports for LUYET IMMOBILIER SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LUYET IMMOBILIER SA
- LUYET IMMOBILIER SA has its legal headquarters in Sion and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- LUYET IMMOBILIER SA was founded on 17.12.2004.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.07.2020. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company LUYET IMMOBILIER SA is the following: CHE-112.151.770.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.009.567-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.151.770
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation et la gestion de biens immobiliers dans toutes sortes d'activités commerciales (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 11.03.2020 | 06.07.2020 | |
COFIDASS Fiduciaire & Assurances Yves Lonfat | Martigny-Combe | 23.12.2004 | 10.03.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LUYET CONSTRUCTIONS METALLIQUES SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LUYET IMMOBILIER SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004947039, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
LUYET IMMOBILIER SA, à Sion, CHE-112.151.770, société anonyme (No. FOSC 129 du 07.07.2020, Publ. 1004931322).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Reynard, Joël, de Savièse, à Savièse, directeur adjoint, avec signature individuelle;
Dubuis, Nicolas, de Savièse, à Mont-Noble, avec signature collective à deux avec le président et directeur ou le secrétaire.
Publication number: HR02-1004931322, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
LUYET CONSTRUCTIONS METALLIQUES SA, à Sion, CHE-112.151.770, société anonyme (No. FOSC 84 du 01.05.2020, Publ. 1004881678).
Modification des statuts:
17.06.2020.
Transfert de patrimoine:
selon contrat de transfert de patrimoine du 17.06.2020, la société a transféré certains actifs de CHF 1'866'961.03 et certains passifs envers les tiers de CHF 943'541.70, soit un actif net de CHF 923'419.33, à la société anonyme nouvellement constituée LUYET CONSTRUCTIONS METALLIQUES SA, à Sion (CHE-454.200.967).
Contre-prestation:
2000 actions nominatives de CHF 100.00, liées selon statuts, entièrement libérées et une créance de CHF 723'419.33 en faveur de l'apporteur.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
LUYET IMMOBILIER SA.
Nouveau but:
L'exploitation et la gestion de biens immobiliers dans toutes sortes d'activités commerciales (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Nouveaux faits qualifiés:
[biffé: apport en nature et reprise de biens : selon contrat du 14.12.2004 et bilan au 31.10.2004, il est fait apport des actifs et passifs de la raison individuelle "Luyet Jean-Robert" à Sion, soit un actif net de CHF 1'013'135, 88 accepté pour ce prix et dont CHF 200'000.-- sont imputés sur le capital contre remise de la totalité des actions, le solde constituant une créance envers la société].
Nouvelles communications:
Communication aux actionnaires: par écrit ou par courriel.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Reynard, Delphine, de Savièse, à Savièse, administratrice et secrétaire, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: Reynard-Luyet, Delphine];
Luyet, Jean Robert, de Savièse, à Savièse, président, directeur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: Luyet, Jean-Robert]. Selon déclaration du 17.06.2020, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.