Reports for Loreto Consult AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Loreto Consult AG
- Loreto Consult AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Buonas. Loreto Consult AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Loreto Consult AG, which was founded on the 13.09.1988, consists of one person.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 07.12.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Loreto Consult AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.502.983.
- Next to the company Loreto Consult AG there are 10 other active companies with an identical address. These include: cré'mar GmbH, ETAG Energie + Technologie AG, Focus Gastro GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.09.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Risch
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.013.937-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.502.983
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Verleasung von Industrieprodukten, Erbringung von Dienstleistungen auf betriebswirtschaftlichem Gebiet sowie Handel mit, Vermietung und Verleasung von Transportfahrzeugen; kann Beteiligungen und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie Tochtergesellschaften errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
A. Emmenegger AG | Zug | <2004 | 24.06.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Biohumus Organische Abfallverwertungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Loreto Consult AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3916591, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Loreto Consult AG, in Zug, CHE-101.502.983, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2017, Publ. 3290575).
Statutenänderung:
17.11.2017.
Sitz neu:
Risch.
Domizil neu:
Verenaweg 17, 6343 Buonas.
Publication number: 3290575, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Loreto Consult AG, in Zug, CHE-101.502.983, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 29.03.2016, Publ. 2745583).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nauer, Philip, von Bremgarten (AG), in Horw, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nauer, Stefan René, von Bremgarten (AG), in Steinhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2745583, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Loreto Consult AG, in Zug, CHE-101.502.983, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2016, Publ. 2698987).
Domizil neu:
Unterleh 4, 6300 Zug.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.