Address
c/o Dr. iur. Sandro Costa
Chesa Suot Muragls 4
7504 Pontresina
Reports for Lorenz Gredig AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lorenz Gredig AG
- Lorenz Gredig AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Pontresina.
- The management of the company Lorenz Gredig AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 02.06.1936.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 25.11.2011. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.616.913.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.06.1936
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pontresina
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.002.719-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.616.913
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Bewirtschaftung und Verpachtung von landwirtschaftlichen Grundstücken; die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern und kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eltschinger & Partner AG | Thalwil | 18.04.2005 | 24.11.2011 | |
Schweizerische Gesellschaft für Hotelkredit SGH | Zürich | <2004 | 17.04.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lorenz Gredig AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6432274, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Lorenz Gredig AG, in Pontresina, CH-350.3.002.719-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2010, S. 11, Publ. 5730348).
Statutenänderung:
10.11.2011.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB oder, wenn die Adressen aller Aktionäre bekannt sind, durch eingeschriebenen Brief oder telegrafisch. Gemäss Erklärung vom 10.11.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eltschinger Audit & Consulting AG, in Oberrieden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5730348, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Lorenz Gredig AG, in Pontresina, CH-350.3.002.719-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2005, S. 11, Publ. 2795518).
Domizil neu:
c/o Dr. iur. Sandro Costa, Via Muragls Suot 4, 7504 Pontresina.
Publication number: 2795518, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Lorenz Gredig AG, in Pontresina, CH-350.3.002.719-1, Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Bewirtschaftung und Verpachtung von landwirtschaftlichen Grundstücken, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2001, S. 791).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schweizerische Gesellschaft für Hotelkredit SGH, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bardola, Duri, von Sent, in Greifensee, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident und Delegierter];
Valentin, Hansjürg, von Sent, in Pontresina, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter];
Eltschinger Audit & Consulting AG, in Oberrieden, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.