Reports for LongTec Services AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LongTec Services AG
- LongTec Services AG is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Port.
- The management of the company LongTec Services AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 10.12.2004.
- On the 02.11.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company LongTec Services AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.144.445.
- On the same address there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: ACTIX GmbH, IPS Integrated Power Solutions AG, Pretec AG Metrology.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.12.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Port
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.005.273-4
UID/VAT
CHE-112.144.445
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Beratungs- und Management-Dienstleistungen. Sie kann ferner den Handel mit Industrieprodukten insbesondere im Bereich Elektronik und Elektrotechnik betreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
axalta Revisionen AG | Sutz-Lattrigen | 16.05.2012 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ANBA Treuhand AG | Sutz-Lattrigen | 23.08.2011 | 15.05.2012 | |
TRZ Treuhand Zulauf AG | Büren an der Aare | 18.05.2010 | 22.08.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Long Tec AG
- RUI LONG Services GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
liflex | 01.11.2013 | deleted | 56402/2013 |
Newest SOGC notifications: LongTec Services AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005595477, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
LongTec Services AG, in Port, CHE-112.144.445, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004904660).
Statutenänderung:
25.10.2022.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'200'000.00 [bisher: CHF 800'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'200'000.00 [bisher: CHF 800'000.00].
Aktien neu:
1'200 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 800 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 25.10.2022 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 400'000.00 verrechnet, wofür 400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden.
Publication number: HR02-1004904660, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
LongTec Services AG, in Port, CHE-112.144.445, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 25.11.2016, Publ. 3184067).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgi, Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Freiamt (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christ, Markus, von Wisen (SO) und Winznau, in Biel/Bienne, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nan, Ze, chinesische Staatsangehörige, in Peking (CN), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Berger, Friedrich Viktor, von Wengi, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3184067, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
LongTec Services AG, in Port, CHE-112.144.445, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 10.02.2014, Publ. 1336015).
Statutenänderung:
18.11.2016.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 800'000.00 [bisher: CHF 400'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 800'000.00 [bisher: CHF 400'000.00].
Aktien neu:
800 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 18.11.2016 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 200'000.00 verrechnet, wofür, zusammen mit einer Barleinlage von CHF 200'000.00, 400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden. [Namenaktien vinkuliert gemäss Statuten].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
axalta Revisionen AG (CHE-421.858.060), in Sutz (Sutz-Lattrigen), Revisionsstelle [bisher: axalta Revisionen AG (CH-036.9.053.371-4), in Brügg].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.