Address
Walter-Denzler-Strasse 3
8640 Rapperswil SG
Reports for Lido Catering GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lido Catering GmbH
- Lido Catering GmbH has its legal headquarters in Rapperswil SG, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 19.10.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company Lido Catering GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-103.046.045.
Management (5)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Marco Mayer,
Marcel Eduard Charles Bennet,
Cyrill Gebert,
Markus Bütler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.05.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.048.062-4
UID/VAT
CHE-103.046.045
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Restaurants und Verpflegungsständen, insbesondere das Restaurant und alle in und um das Eissportstadion liegenden Verpflegungsstände. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke, Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG, Zweigniederlassung Rapperswil SG | Rapperswil-Jona | 19.10.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lido Catering GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005864635, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lido Catering GmbH, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-103.046.045, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2021, Publ. 1005296558).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mengis, Thibaud, von Visp, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mayer, Marco, von Egnach, in Horgen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
OBT AG, Zweigniederlassung Rapperswil SG (CHE-193.282.619), in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005296558, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lido Catering GmbH, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-103.046.045, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 254 vom 30.12.2020, Publ. 1005062233).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aebersold, Denise, von Freimettigen, in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruggli, Sandro, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gebert, Cyrill, von Eschenbach (SG), in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bennet, Marcel Eduard Charles, von Andermatt, in Lachen SZ (Lachen), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005062233, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lido Catering GmbH, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-103.046.045, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 11.02.2019, Publ. 1004563417).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schilling, Timo, von Sirnach, in Aadorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lakers Sport AG (CHE-105.632.946), in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00 [bisher: Lakers Sport AG (CH-320.3.048.402-4), Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Mengis, Thibaud, von Visp, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aebersold, Denise, von Freimettigen, in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.