Address
Walter-Denzler-Strasse 3
8640 Rapperswil SG
Reports for Lakers Nachwuchs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lakers Nachwuchs AG
- Lakers Nachwuchs AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Rapperswil SG. Lakers Nachwuchs AG belongs to the industry «Sport services» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 07.02.2017 and has 4 persons in its management.
- On the 19.10.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-308.466.450.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Roger Maier,
Marcel Eduard Charles Bennet,
Claudio Bayer,
Markus Bütler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.081.561-5
UID/VAT
CHE-308.466.450
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Nachwuchsorganisation zur ganzheitlichen Förderung von Eishockeyspielern in allen Altersstufen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG, Zweigniederlassung Rapperswil SG | Rapperswil-Jona | 19.10.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lakers Nachwuchs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005864633, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lakers Nachwuchs AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-308.466.450, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2021, Publ. 1005296557). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 28.01.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imhof, Thomas, von Fahrni, in Weinfelden, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OBT AG, Zweigniederlassung Rapperswil SG (CHE-193.282.619), in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Revisionsstelle;
Maier, Roger, von Spiez, in Stehrenberg (Bussnang), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005296557, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lakers Nachwuchs AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-308.466.450, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2020, Publ. 1005047962).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Thomas, von Mels, in Dürnten, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Aebersold, Denise, von Freimettigen, in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imhof, Thomas, von Fahrni, in Weinfelden, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Bennet, Marcel Eduard Charles, von Andermatt, in Lachen SZ (Lachen), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005047962, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lakers Nachwuchs AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-308.466.450, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2017, S.0, Publ. 3800507).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
König, Simon, von Bern, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aebersold, Denise, von Freimettigen, in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.