Address
c/o TERTIANUM AG
Giessenplatz 1
8600 Dübendorf
Reports for Leben im Alter AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Leben im Alter AG
- Leben im Alter AG is active in the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Dübendorf.
- Leben im Alter AG was founded on 22.12.2007.
- On the 17.05.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-153.034.593.
- Next to the company Leben im Alter AG there are 13 other active companies with an identical address. These include: All Out Golf GmbH, Clickwise KlG, Furger und Partner AG Strategieentwicklung.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Schuler,
Stefan Ralf Knabl,
Tanja Désirée Hilber,
Dr. med. Ryan Aryono Tandjung,
Nicolas Félix Crognaletti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.12.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dübendorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.045.545-6
UID/VAT
CHE-153.034.593
CHE-255.364.990 VAT
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Wohnbereich, insbesondere für das Leben im Dritten Alter. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann auch ohne angemessene Entschädigung mit anderen Konzerngesellschaften Geschäfte abschliessen, insbesondere mit ihren direkten oder indirekten Aktionären und anderen nahestehenden Gesellschaften, auch wenn diese Geschäfte teilweise oder ausschliesslich im Interesse dieser anderen Gruppengesellschaften liegen. Die Gesellschaft kann insbesondere Konzerngesellschaften Kredite gewähren oder für deren Verbindlichkeiten Garantien oder andere Sicherheiten aller Art gewähren sowie sich an Cash Pooling-Verträgen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner alle Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem vorstehenden Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 02.04.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Leben im Alter AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006034061, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Leben im Alter AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-153.034.593, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2023, Publ. 1005859715).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sutter-Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005859715, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Leben im Alter AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-153.034.593, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 05.06.2023, Publ. 1005759680).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stäger, Luca, von Merenschwand, in Einsiedeln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: HR02-1005759680, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 14567 vom 05.04.2023 Leben im Alter AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-153.034.593, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023, Publ. 1005721265). Herr Sutter- Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, wurde mit dem Eintrag im Tagesregister 14624 vom 05.04.2023 und SHAB 70 vom 12.04.2023 irrtümlich gelöscht statt mutiert.
Neu:
Sutter- Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien (bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter-Della Valle, Sandro Olivier, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.