Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o R. Voutat
chemin de la Vy-Creuse 57
1196 Gland
Head office
Other branches (7)
Reports for Laurent Membrez S.A., succursale de Gland
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.1981
Deletion from the commercial register
01.07.2019
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Gland
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.001.472-7
UID/VAT
CHE-210.683.275
Sector
Road, railway and tunnel construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Travaux de construction, génie civil et voies ferrées; location de services.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Laurent Membrez SA, succursale de Gland
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Laurent Membrez S.A., succursale de Gland
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004664213, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., succursale de Gland, à Gland, CHE-210.683.275 (FOSC du 02.10.2015, p. 0/2405805).
Siège principal:
Aclens. La raison de commerce est radiée par suite de suppression de la succursale.
Publication number: 2405805, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., succursale de Gland, à Gland, CHE-210.683.275 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Siège principal:
Lausanne.
Nouveau siège principal:
Aclens.
Publication number: 5220026, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., succursale de Gland, à Gland, CH-550-1001472-7, travaux de construction, génie civil et voies ferrées (FOSC du 06.01.2006, p. 15/3181688).
Siège prinicpal:
Lausanne. La signature de Gasparini Monique est radiée. Les informations relatives aux personnes disposant d'un pouvoir de représentation pour toute l'entreprise sont radiées conformément à l'art. 110, al. 1, let. e ORC, suite à la modification du droit du registre du commerce.
Sont concernés:
Membrez Yves, Magnoni Patrick, Membrez Verena, Monod Michel, Prince Paul, Scotto Mario, Michoud Christian, Mann Félix et Béguin Jacques.