Branches (8)
Reports for Laurent Membrez S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Laurent Membrez S.A.
- Laurent Membrez S.A. from Aclens operates in the sector «Road, railway and tunnel construction» and is active.
- The management consists of 13 persons. The company was founded on 23.02.1962.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 12.04.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Laurent Membrez S.A. is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-101.252.326.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Erep S.A., Etudes et Applications d'Energies Renouvelables et d'Epuration, Fondation de prévoyance LM.
Management (13)
newest board members
Félix Jürg Mann,
Oliviero Iubatti,
Laurence Grandjean-Perrenoud-Contesse
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Collins,
Jacques Rouhier,
Francesca Paupe,
Ivo Felgueiras,
Raphaël Käsermann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.02.1962
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aclens
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.001.471-9
UID/VAT
CHE-101.252.326
Sector
Road, railway and tunnel construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Travaux de construction, génie civil et voies ferrées; location de services.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Epalinges | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Laurent Membrez SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Laurent Membrez S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006008086, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., à Aclens, CHE-101.252.326 (FOSC du 22.03.2024, p. 0/1005992790). Radiation de la mention de l'existence d'une succursale à L'Isle (CHE-273.597.121).
Publication number: HR02-1005992790, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., à Aclens, CHE-101.252.326 (FOSC du 02.02.2023, p. 0/1005668614). Scotto Mario et Membrez Yves ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Procuration collective à deux est conférée à Collin Thomas, de France, à Montagny (FR).
Publication number: HR02-1005668614, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laurent Membrez S.A., à Aclens, CHE-101.252.326 (FOSC du 17.10.2022, p. 0/1005584838). La signature de Guignard Lionel est radiée. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Rouhier Jacques, de France, à Langnau am Albis, directeur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.