Address
c/o Ch. Gerber
Vogelhalde 146
4494 Oltingen
Reports for Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen
- Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen from Oltingen operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The organization was founded on 14.12.1964 and has 5 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 09.02.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.410.485.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Stefan Weitnauer,
Rolf Spycher,
Simon Pfaff,
Anton Gass,
Christoph Gerber
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.12.1964
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Oltingen
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.5.914.417-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.410.485
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Wahrung und Förderung der landwirtschaftlichen Interessen der Mitglieder in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe durch Verkauf landwirtschaftlicher Bedarfsartikel; Dienstleistungen wie Vermieten von Maschinen usw.; Förderung der beruflichen Kenntnisse der Mitglieder und des genossenschaftlichen Geistes durch geeignete Veranstaltungen. Die Genossenschaft kann ihre Tätigkeit auch auf andere Gebiete der Land- und Volkswirtschaft ausdehnen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005957439, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen, in Oltingen, CHE-100.410.485, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2019, Publ. 1004692204).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gysin, Rolf, von Oltingen, in Oltingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weitnauer, Stefan, von Oltingen, in Oltingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004692204, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen, in Oltingen, CHE-100.410.485, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2017, Publ. 3296017).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfaff, Peter, von Oltingen, in Oltingen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Thommen, Bruno, von Oltingen, in Oltingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfaff, Simon, von Oltingen, in Oltingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Spycher, Rolf, von Rothenfluh, in Oltingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3296017, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Oltingen, in Oltingen, CHE-100.410.485, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 06.02.2004).
Statutenänderung:
23.03.2016. Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.04.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.