Reports for Lackierwerk Roggwil AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lackierwerk Roggwil AG
- Lackierwerk Roggwil AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Roggwil BE. Lackierwerk Roggwil AG belongs to the industry «Production and processing of iron and steel» and is currently active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 08.05.2023.
- Lackierwerk Roggwil AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-465.214.577.
- Alpha Küchen Design GmbH, atexxi Systems AG, Mira Manufaktur GmbH are registered at the same address.
Management (5)
newest board members
Pascal Zumstein,
Bernd Günther,
Benjamin Simon Kurt,
Alfred Rechsteiner
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Pascal Zumstein,
Bernd Günther,
Benjamin Simon Kurt,
Alfred Rechsteiner,
Renate Lüscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.11.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Roggwil (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.075.874-4
UID/VAT
CHE-465.214.577
Sector
Production and processing of iron and steel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Beschichtung und Veredelung von Oberflächen sowie die Ausführung von Lackierarbeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lackierwerk Roggwil AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005740334, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lackierwerk Roggwil AG, in Roggwil (BE), CHE-465.214.577, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2018, Publ. 1004511508).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Diem, Sandro, von Herisau, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1004511508, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lackierwerk Roggwil AG, in Roggwil (BE), CHE-465.214.577, St. Urbanstrasse 34, 4914 Roggwil BE, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
26.11.2018.
Zweck:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Beschichtung und Veredelung von Oberflächen sowie die Ausführung von Lackierarbeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, Telefax, E-Mail oder Zustellung gegen Empfangsbestätigung an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.11.2018 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Günther, Bernd Michael, von Zofingen, in Strengelbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rechsteiner, Alfred, von Rehetobel, in Wiesendangen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Diem, Sandro, von Herisau, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kurt, Benjamin Simon, von Roggwil (BE), in Roggwil BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zumstein, Pascal, von Ochlenberg, in Roggwil BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lüscher, Renate, von Muhen, in Rothrist, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.