Address
c/o B. Nicod SA
Galeries Benjamin-Constant 1
1003 Lausanne
Reports for La Vidynette A. S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout La Vidynette A. S.A.
- La Vidynette A. S.A. is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- The company was founded on 30.04.1958.
- On the 30.08.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-103.087.535.
- On the same address there are 32 other active companies registered. These include: 1010 Trading SA, Art Com & Partenaires Sàrl, Betica S.A., succursale de Lausanne.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1958
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.048.143-4
UID/VAT
CHE-103.087.535
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Opérations immobilières.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidinter SA | Lausanne | 24.10.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Contrôle des finances de la Ville de Lausanne (CFL) | Lausanne | 10.02.1994 | 23.10.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- La Vidynette A SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: La Vidynette A. S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005827085, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Vidynette A. S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-103.087.535 (FOSC du 10.01.2022, p. 0/1005377552). Thalmann Benoît n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Lazazzera Gerardo, d'Italie, à Paudex, est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005377552, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Vidynette A. S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-103.087.535 (FOSC du 24.10.2019, p. 0/1004744619). Faucherre Andrea n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Thalmann Benoît est nommé président. Yenni Guignard Sophie, de et à Lausanne, est membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004744619, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Vidynette A. S.A., à Lausanne, CHE-103.087.535 (FOSC du 09.11.2018, p. 0/1004494795). Contrôle des finances de la Ville de Lausanne (CFL) (CHE-113.941.154) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fidinter SA (CHE-105.925.319), à Lausanne.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.