Address
c/o Genossenschaft Elektrizitätswerk Blatten
Faflerstrasse 36
3919 Blatten (Lötschen)
Reports for KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG
- KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG with its legal headquarters in Blatten (Lötschen) is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Electrical power production and utilities». KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG is active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 18.07.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-116.117.275.
- Companies with an identical address: Genossenschaft Elektrizitätswerke Blatten (EW Blatten), KW Fafleralp AG, KW Gisentella AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christian Rubin,
Andreas Ritler,
Yvan Kalbermatten,
Jonas Tobias Kalbermatten,
Jakob Murmann
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Christian Rubin,
Andreas Ritler,
Yvan Kalbermatten,
Jonas Tobias Kalbermatten,
Jakob Murmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Blatten
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.014.303-5
UID/VAT
CHE-116.117.275
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Baut das Kraftwerk Indrä Faflerbach und produziert Strom. Die Stromproduktion wird zum bestmöglichen Preis verwertet. Bei einer allgemeinen Stromverknappung hat die Sicherstellung einer preiswerten Stromversorgung auf dem Territorium der Gemeinde Blatten erste Priorität. Kann sich an Unternehmen beteiligen, die denselben oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand marugg + imsand ag | Brig-Glis | 27.10.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005798407, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG, in Blatten, CHE-116.117.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 22.07.2021, Publ. 1005255839).
Domizil neu:
c/o Genossenschaft Elektrizitätswerk Blatten, Faflerstrasse 36, 3919 Blatten (Lötschen).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lehner, Hans Peter, von Blatten, in Blatten, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Henzen, Armin, von Wiler (Lötschen), in Zug, Mitglied, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rubin, Christian, von Blatten, in Blatten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Ritler, Andreas, von Blatten, in Blatten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Kalbermatten, Yvan, von Blatten, in Blatten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005255839, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG, in Blatten, CHE-116.117.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2019, Publ. 1004651761).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hans Peter Lehner, Tiefenmattenstrasse 29, 3919 Blatten (Lötschen).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bellwald, Bruno, von Blatten, in Blatten, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kalbermatten, Hans Anton, von Blatten, in Brig-Glis, Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kalbermatten, Jonas Tobias, von Blatten, in Naters, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Murmann, Jakob, von Kippel, in Blatten (Lötschen) (Blatten), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1004651761, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
KW Breithorn-Fafleralp AG, in Blatten, CHE-116.117.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 07.06.2017, S.0, Publ. 3564885).
Domizil neu:
Tiefenmattenstrasse 29, 3919 Blatten (Lötschen).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.