Reports for Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers
- Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers has its legal headquarters in Happerswil, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers has 2 persons entered in its management.
- On the 24.10.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register TG under the UID CHE-115.296.034.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Birwinken
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.022.732-9
UID/VAT
CHE-115.296.034
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen eines Ingenieurbüros für Holzbau sowie Erbringung von Ingenieurleistungen im Hoch- und Tiefbau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Krattiger Engineering AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005589527, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers, in Birwinken, CHE-115.296.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2022, Publ. 1005577377).
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 10.10.2022 Aktiven von CHF 236'002.00 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 13'000.00 auf die Krattiger Engineering AG, in Birwinken (CHE-302.837.134).
Gegenleistung:
keine.
Publication number: HR02-1005577377, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Krattiger Engineering AG, in Birwinken, CHE-115.296.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2018, Publ. 4332303).
Statutenänderung:
27.09.2022.
Firma neu:
Krattiger AG Consulting Engineers.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. [Anpassung Funktionsbezeichnungen von Amtes wegen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gnägi, Andreas, von Täuffelen, in Zihlschlacht (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krattiger, Markus, von Schüpfen, in Happerswil (Birwinken), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ullmann, Renate, von Wildhaus, in Happerswil (Birwinken), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4332303, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Krattiger Engineering AG, in Birwinken, CHE-115.296.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 11.10.2011, Publ. 6372252).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gnägi, Andreas, von Täuffelen, in Zihlschlacht (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.