Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Head office
Other branches (11)
Reports for KPMG Fides
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.05.1992
Deletion from the commercial register
26.02.2007
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Root
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.9.015.002-8
UID/VAT
CHE-282.168.440
Sector
no information known
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratungs- u. Treuhandgesellschaft mit Schwergewicht Wirtschaftsberatung, bes. Rechts-, Steuer-, Unternehmensberatung usw
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KPMG Fides
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3796400, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
KPMG Fides, in Root, CH-100.9.015.002-8, Erbringung aller Dienstleistungen, die zum Tätigkeitsbereich einer Beratungs- und Treuhandgesellschaft gehören, mit Schwergewicht Wirtschaftsberatung, insbesondere Rechts-, Steuer- und... Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2006, S. 9, Publ. 3527168).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Zürich. Aufhebung dieser Zweigniederlassung infolge Löschung der Gesellschaft am Hauptsitz durch Fusion mit der KPMG AG (bisher KPMG Fides Peat), in Zürich (CH-020.3.001.933-8). Der auf die Zweigniederlassung bezügliche Eintrag im Handelsregister wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3527168, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
KPMG Fides, in Root, CH-100.9.015.002-8, Erbringung aller Dienstleistungen, die zum Tätigkeitsbereich einer Beratungs- und Treuhandgesellschaft gehören, mit Schwergewicht Wirtschaftsberatung, insbesondere Rechts-, Steuer- und... Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2006, S. 9, Publ. 3276014).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steinegger, Mark, von Altendorf, in Schwyz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Domenghini, Federico, von Malvaglia, in Malvaglia, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3276014, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
KPMG Fides, in Root, CH-100.9.015.002-8, Erbringung aller Dienstleistungen, die zum Tätigkeitsbereich einer Beratungs- und Treuhandgesellschaft gehören, mit Schwergewicht Wirtschaftsberatung, insbesondere Rechts-, Steuer- und... Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 10.11.2005, S. 8, Publ. 3097506).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aepli, Dr. Hans, von Niederhelfenschwil, in Kriens, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herzog, Dr. Peter, von Homburg, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied];
Lampert, Frank, von Fläsch, in Küssnacht SZ, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Küssnacht am Rigi].