Reports for KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG
- KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG with its legal headquarters in Wohlen AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG is active.
- KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.01.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG is the following: CHE-431.854.307.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.07.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wohlen (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.037.012-7
UID/VAT
CHE-431.854.307
CHE-475.382.360 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen eines Ingenieurbüros für Tiefbau, Planung, Vermessung und Geoinformatik; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Litrag & Partner AG | Wohlen (AG) | 05.07.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005945411, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG, in Wohlen (AG), CHE-431.854.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 159 vom 18.08.2023, Publ. 1005819405).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Sonnmattweg 6A, 5620 Bremgarten AG]. Luzernerstrasse 35, 5630 Muri AG [bisher: Caspar Wolf-Weg 5, 5630 Muri AG].
Publication number: HR02-1005819405, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG, in Wohlen (AG), CHE-431.854.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 22.04.2022, Publ. 1005456604).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Moos, Renato, von Bettwil, in Villmergen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Duss, Adrian, von Ruswil, in Windisch, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005456604, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
KIP Ingenieure und Planer AG, in Wohlen (AG), CHE-431.854.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 21.05.2019, Publ. 1004634855).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knoblauch, Hans Peter, von Wohlen AG, in Muri AG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Knoblauch, Caroline, von Wohlen AG, in Morschach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Arnet, Markus, von Wolhusen, in Berikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hasler, Daniel, von Hellikon, in Kaiseraugst, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Kanig, Ivo Friedbert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Waltenschwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Reber, Kurt, von Schangnau, in Bremgarten AG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wilke, Sabine, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Zimmermann, Thomas, von Widen, in Biberstein, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Duss, Adrian, von Ruswil, in Windisch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Moos, Renato, von Bettwil, in Villmergen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fricker, Jules, von Holderbank (AG), in Biberstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.