Reports for Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung
- Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Steinen, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management of the organization Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung consists of 7 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 03.04.2009.
- On the 05.01.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.808.227.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Gerken Physiotherapie, M-A-Treuhand GmbH, Restaurant Husmatt GmbH.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christina Müller,
Edith Styger,
Albin Anton Marty,
Margareta Wymann,
Urs Affolter
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.04.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Steinen
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.7.014.412-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.808.227
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt in der Nähe des Dorfzentrums der Gemeinde Steinen, insbesondere auf den Liegenschaften GB 474 und GB 1322 altersgerecht konzipierten Miet- und Eigentumswohnraum für Menschen im fortgeschrittenen Alter zu schaffen und den Mietwohnraum auch zu unterhalten; kann bei Bedarf Dienstleistungen erbringen; der zu erstellende Wohnraum versteht sich als Ergänzung zum bestehenden Alters- und Pflegezentrum Au, Steinen; wo möglich ist eine Zusammenarbeit zwischen der Stiftung und dem Alters- und Pflegezentrum Au anzustreben; hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt mit der Vermietung von preisgünstigen Alterswohnungen keine Gewinnabsicht; Gewinn aus dem Verkauf von Baulandparzellen sowie aus einem möglichen Verkauf von Maximal einem Drittel der Wohnungen dient vollständig der Vergünstigung von Alters-Mietwohnungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA Revisions AG | Schwyz | 09.04.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005925989, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung, in Steinen, CHE-114.808.227, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2023, Publ. 1005904912).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marty, Josef, von Schwyz, in Steinen, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Christina, von Werthenstein, in Steinen, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1005904912, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung, in Steinen, CHE-114.808.227, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644385).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ullmann, Roland, von Eschenz, in Steinen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Iten, Roland, von Oberägeri, in Steinen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005644385, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Katharina und Karl von Rickenbach-Stiftung, in Steinen, CHE-114.808.227, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.2019, Publ. 1004641625).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Styger, Edith, von Steinerberg, in Steinen, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Ullmann, Roland, von Eschenz, in Steinen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.