Reports for Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH
- Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH has its legal headquarters in Uster and is active. It operates in the sector «Other social services».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 26.10.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-114.474.439.
- Companies with an identical address: Benefeel Ltd liab. Co., Besmed AG, Bonito Finance GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.08.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.038.494-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.474.439
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer oder mehrerer Kinderkrippen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Shining Stars GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005869364, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Shining Stars GmbH, in Dübendorf, CHE-114.474.439, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2023, Publ. 1005813560).
Statutenänderung:
17.10.2023.
Firma neu:
Joey Kinderkrippe Daycare GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Uster.
Domizil neu:
Zürichstrasse 6, 8610 Uster.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer oder mehrerer Kinderkrippen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oberholzer-Majewska, Ewa, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Nürensdorf, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thaler, Marco, von Gaiserwald, in Bonstetten, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005813560, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Shining Stars GmbH, in Dübendorf, CHE-114.474.439, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2017, Publ. 3722379).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Joey Group AG (CHE-448.168.545), in Uster, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Thaler, Marco, von Gaiserwald, in Bonstetten, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Oberholzer-Majewska, Ewa, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Nürensdorf, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Locher, Maurice, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3722379, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Shining Stars GmbH, in Dübendorf, CHE-114.474.439, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2011, Publ. 6473300).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oberholzer-Majewska, Ewa, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Nürensdorf, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Brütten].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.