Reports for Jaggi & Rieder AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jaggi & Rieder AG
- Jaggi & Rieder AG with its legal headquarters in Saanen is active. Jaggi & Rieder AG operates in the sector «Other construction».
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 05.09.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.222.246.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Support Service Gstaad Mayor, Trouvailles Gessenay GmbH.
Management (9)
newest board members
Antonin Olivier Raoul Guez,
Julien Marc Henri Raboud,
Louis Lanz
newest authorized signatories
Guido Tranel,
Antonin Olivier Raoul Guez,
Julien Marc Henri Raboud,
Heinz Frautschi,
Michael Brand
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saanen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.002.006-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.222.246
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Fachbetriebes für Heizung, Lüftung, Klima, Sanitär und Haustechnik, alle damit im Zusammenhang stehenden Arbeiten und Reparaturen, Unterhalt, den Handel mit entsprechenden Apparaten und Geräten sowie den Erwerb, die Verwertung und Veräusserung von Lizenzen, sowie die Planung und Realisierung von haustechnischen Einrichtungen aller Art. Im Übrigen kann die Gesellschaft alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche der Wahrung und Förderung der Konzerninteressen dienen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Konzerngesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 05.09.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 21.07.2022 | 04.09.2024 | |
T & R Oberland AG | Lenk | 09.09.2010 | 20.07.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Jaggi Conrad AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jaggi & Rieder AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006122302, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jaggi & Rieder AG, in Saanen, CHE-107.222.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 28.08.2023, Publ. 1005824597).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-441.858.784), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005824597, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jaggi & Rieder AG, in Saanen, CHE-107.222.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 24.02.2023, Publ. 1005686628).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niedhart, Nicolas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tranel, Guido, von Kirchlindach, in Erlinsbach (Erlinsbach (AG)), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005686628, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jaggi & Rieder AG, in Saanen, CHE-107.222.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2022, Publ. 1005525816).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Prüssing, Mathias, von Bern, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Guez, Antonin, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Gockhausen (Dübendorf), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.