Address
c/o Simon Birlin
Wright-Strasse 35
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon)
Reports for Jackys Stapferstube AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jackys Stapferstube AG
- Jackys Stapferstube AG from Glattpark (Opfikon) operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants» and is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.04.2022.
- The company Jackys Stapferstube AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.399.053.
- Next to the company Jackys Stapferstube AG there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Calypta AG, SaSté Atelier Seiler & Partner.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.914.183-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.399.053
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Führen von Restaurantsbetrieben inklusive Bar sowie das Betreiben von Eventlokalen und Dienstleistungen im Gastronomiebereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Sie kann Immaterialgüterrechte wie Patente, Handelsmarken etc. erwerben, verwalten, übertragen und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit ihrem Zweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängenden kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ONYX Treuhand AG | Langnau am Albis | <2004 | 26.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jackys Stapferstube AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005443885, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jackys Stapferstube AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.399.053, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2017, Publ. 3753947).
Statutenänderung:
11.03.2022.
Sitz neu:
Opfikon.
Domizil neu:
c/o Simon Birlin, Wright-Strasse 35, 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon).
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Führen von Restaurantsbetrieben inklusive Bar sowie das Betreiben von Eventlokalen und Dienstleistungen im Gastronomiebereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Sie kann Immaterialgüterrechte wie Patente, Handelsmarken etc. erwerben, verwalten, übertragen und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit ihrem Zweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängenden kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofer, Cornelia Martina, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Birlin, Simon, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Opfikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: 3753947, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jackys Stapferstube AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.399.053, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 17.11.2014, Publ. 1825345).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Birlin, Simon, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hofer, Cornelia Martina, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zollinger-Ambrosetti, Sandra, von Uetikon am See, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1825345, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jackys Stapferstube AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.399.053, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 27.08.2009, S. 27, Publ. 5217728).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rauber-Aschinger, Beatrice, von Appenzell, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Birlin, Simon, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.