Reports for Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH
- Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH has its legal headquarters in Luzern, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.04.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-107.452.237.
- Companies with the same address as Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH: Adriaan Westenbrink GmbH, Bühlmann & Kuhn AG, Daniel Meyer Fotostudio GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.021.313-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.452.237
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Dienstleitungen im Bereich Architektur, Bauplanung und Bauführung. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trescor Treuhand Luzern AG | Luzern | 13.08.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Fry Treuhandberatung | Luzern | 08.06.2009 | 12.08.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Architekturbüro Iwan Bühler GmbH
- Architekturbüro Bühler Iwan GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006017515, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-107.452.237, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2023, Publ. 1005795600).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bühlmann, Hans Rudolf, von Malters, in Luzern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005795600, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-107.452.237, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 10.07.2023, Publ. 1005790958).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumgartner, Werner, von Kriens, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00;
Bühler, Iwan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00];
Bühlmann & Kuhn AG (CHE-465.521.329), in Luzern, Gesellschafterin, mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00;
Bühlmann, Hans Rudolf, von Malters, in Luzern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kuhn, Michael, von Braunau, in Luzern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005790958, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Iwan Bühler Architekten GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-107.452.237, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2023, Publ. 1005777579).
Statutenänderung:
29.06.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.