Reports for Itéral Management SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Itéral Management SA
- Itéral Management SA with its legal headquarters in Trélex is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». Itéral Management SA is active.
- The company was founded on 26.12.1996 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.03.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-108.308.979.
- On the same address as Itéral Management SA there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: AC 4 Sàrl, Entreprise Positive Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.12.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Trélex
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.093.113-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.308.979
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
conseils en management et formation de cadres d'entreprises.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Saugy S.A. | Lausanne | <2004 | 05.05.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Itéral management SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Itéral Management SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005991769, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Itéral Management SA, à Trélex, CHE-108.308.979 (FOSC du 12.07.2021, p. 0/1005246986). Lovy Philippe n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Jamolli Bertrand et Labriet Thierry engagent désormais la société par leur signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005246986, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Itéral Management SA, à Trélex, CHE-108.308.979 (FOSC du 23.07.2018, p. 0/4375835). Roy Georges n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Labriet Thierry est nommé secrétaire.
Publication number: 4375835, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Itéral Management SA, à Trélex, CHE-108.308.979 (FOSC du 22.05.2018, p. 0/4240933). Jamolli Bertrand, Roy Georges, et Labriet Thierry, qui ne sont plus directeurs, sont nommés administrateurs;
les trois continuent à signer collectivement à deux. Jamolli Bertrand est nommé président et Roy Georges, secrétaire. L'administrateur Lovy Philippe signe désormais collectivement à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.