Reports for invotas AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout invotas AG
- invotas AG in Zollikon is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Electrical power production and utilities». invotas AG is active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.07.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-283.408.552.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.07.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zollikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.039.445-3
UID/VAT
CHE-283.408.552
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erstellung und den Betrieb von Energieproduktionsanlagen und von Energiespareinrichtungen, den Verkauf von Energie an Endabnehmer sowie die Erbringung von damit in Zusammenhang stehenden Dienstleistungen insbesondere die Bearbeitung technischer Prozesse. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte vornehmen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann bewegliche und unbewegliche Vermögenswerte erwerben, verwalten, belasten, verwerten und verkaufen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- invotas SA
- invotas Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: invotas AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005798641, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
invotas AG, in Zollikon, CHE-283.408.552, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 20.01.2020, Publ. 1004808484).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grünberg, Andreas, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Zollikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Wu Grünberg, Chia-hsun, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004808484, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
invotas AG, in Uitikon, CHE-283.408.552, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2019, Publ. 1004782265).
Statutenänderung:
14.01.2020.
Sitz neu:
Zollikon.
Domizil neu:
Zollikerstrasse 33, 8702 Zollikon.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grünberg, Oliver, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Uitikon, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grünberg, Andreas, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004782265, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
invotas AG, in Uitikon, CHE-283.408.552, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 02.04.2019, Publ. 1004600585).
Statutenänderung:
20.09.2019.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 300'000.00 [bisher: CHF 500'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 300'000.00 [bisher: CHF 500'000.00].
Aktien neu:
3'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 und 3'500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 (Stimmrechtsaktien)]. Bei der Kapitalherabsetzung vom 20.09.2019 werden 500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 und 150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 vernichtet und zurückbezahlt;
die Beachtung der gesetzlichen Vorschriften von Art. 734 OR wird mit öffentlicher Urkunde vom 27.11.2019 festgestellt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grünberg, Andreas, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Zollikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Grünberg, Oliver, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Uitikon, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.