Reports for Inter Agetro GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inter Agetro GmbH
- Inter Agetro GmbH is active in the industry «Repair and installation of machines and equipment» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Forch.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 26.05.2008.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.10.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-114.318.041.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Maur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.037.852-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.318.041
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung allgemeiner Dienstleistungen an computergesteuerten Maschinen wie Programmieren von Teileprogrammen, Überarbeiten von vorhandenen Programmen, sowie das Erstellen und Bearbeiten komplexer Metallbauteile sowie die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Baugewerbe. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Inter CNC GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inter Agetro GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005009073, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Inter CNC GmbH, in Aristau, CHE-114.318.041, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 07.02.2011, S.2, Publ. 6020472). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Maur im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Aargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht. Firma am neuen Sitz Inter Agetro GmbH.
Publication number: HR02-1005008541, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Inter CNC GmbH, bisher in Aristau, CHE-114.318.041, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 07.02.2011, Publ. 6020472).
Statutenänderung:
12.10.2020.
Firma neu:
Inter Agetro GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Maur.
Domizil neu:
Im Brünneli 14, 8127 Forch.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Burow, Susanne, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Aristau, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Montero Martinez-Buzurin, Marinela-Iuliana, rumänische Staatsangehörige, in Maur, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 6020472, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Inter CNC GmbH, in Aristau, CH-020.4.037.852-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 12.07.2010, S. 2, Publ. 5721290).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bannwarth, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Aristau, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burow, Susanne, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Aristau, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.