Reports for Insignis AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Insignis AG
- Insignis AG is active in the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Ulrichen.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 01.07.2008.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.11.2017. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Insignis AG is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-114.395.573.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Expressjob, Imwinkelried Mario, Gesichtshautanalyse, Jana Minarova.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Obergoms
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.032.360-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.395.573
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vertrieb und Vermarktung von Produkten aller Art, insbesondere kosmetischer Produkte; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Insignis AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3897181, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Insignis AG, in Obergoms, CHE-114.395.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 01.02.2016, Publ. 2631497).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aeschimann, Christian, von Trachselwald, in Hausen AG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zimmermann, Patrik, von Eggerberg, in Ulrichen (Obergoms), einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Obergoms, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2631497, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Insignis AG, bisher in Zug, CHE-114.395.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 10.03.2014, Publ. 1388311).
Gründungsstatuten:
26.06.2008.
Statutenänderung:
25.01.2016.
Sitz neu:
Obergoms.
Domizil neu:
Nufenenstrasse 1, 3988 Ulrichen.
Publication number: 2631369, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Insignis AG, in Zug, CHE-114.395.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 10.03.2014, Publ. 1388311). Die Firma wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Obergoms im Handelsregister des Kantons Zug von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.