Reports for IMP - International Mining Projects AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IMP - International Mining Projects AG
- IMP - International Mining Projects AG with its legal headquarters in Amden is active. IMP - International Mining Projects AG operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company IMP - International Mining Projects AG, which was founded on the 17.01.2005, consists of one person.
- The last commercial register change was made on 11.10.2018. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company IMP - International Mining Projects AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.190.675.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Amden
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.008.159-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.190.675
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Internationale Exploration, Mining, Contracting, Processing, Trading und Handel mit Rohstoffen, insbesondere für mineralische Rohstoffe sowie Übernahme von Holdingfunktionen für Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann als Consultant arbeiten sowie Seminare, Entwicklungskurse und Trainings für Führungskräfte sowie diesbezügliche Projekte durchführen, im In- und Ausland Grundstücke erwerben, bebauen, verwalten und veräussern, andere Unternehmen erwerben, gründen oder sich an solchen beteiligen sowie Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Confidar Revision AG | Ilanz/Glion | 21.01.2005 | 16.09.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Youth Globe AG
- FiWiB Schweiz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IMP - International Mining Projects AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004474698, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
IMP - International Mining Projects AG, in Amden, CHE-112.190.675, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2018, Publ. 4393479).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eckart, Dr. Axel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Amden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4393479, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
IMP - International Mining Projects AG, in Amden, CHE-112.190.675, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2016, Publ. 3128383).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kirchner, Eberhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Esslingen (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3128383, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
IMP - International Mining Projects AG, in Amden, CHE-112.190.675, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 31.12.2012, Publ. 6997106).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eckart, Dr. Axel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Amden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kirchner, Eberhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Esslingen (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.