Reports for Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach
- Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Ipsach. Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 07.05.2002.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.09.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-109.573.828.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christian Gnägi,
Roman Nellen,
Werner Gnägi,
Hanna Kapeller-Gnägi,
Ruth Jayet-Gnägi
newest authorized signatories
Christian Gnägi,
Roman Nellen,
Werner Gnägi,
Hanna Kapeller-Gnägi,
Ruth Jayet-Gnägi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.05.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ipsach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.014.341-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.573.828
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Überbauung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken, insbesondere Überbauung der Grundstücke Ipsach-Grundbuchblatt Nrn 150 und 1244.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Verex Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006119177, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach, in Ipsach, CHE-109.573.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 13.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2422055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gnägi Nellen, Verena, von Ipsach und Naters, in Ipsach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gnägi, Christian, von Ipsach, in Ipsach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gnägi, Werner, von Ipsach, in Dotzigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Nellen, Roman, von Naters, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2422055, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach, in Ipsach, CHE-109.573.828, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 14.05.2002, S. 3, Publ. 466734).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Verex Treuhand AG (CHE-107.175.368), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Verex Treuhand AG, in Biel BE].
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Immo Quellmatt AG Ipsach, in Ipsach, Quellmattstrasse 5, 2563 Ipsach, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
27.04.2002.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Überbauung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken, insbesondere Überbauung der Grundstücke Ipsach-Grundbuchblatt Nrn 150 und 1244.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt gemäss Sacheinlagevertrag vom 27.04.2002 die Gründstücke Ipsach-Grundbuchblatt Nrn 150 und 1244 zum Gesamtpreis von CHF 1'400'000.--, wofür 100 voll liberierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 1'300'000.-- als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Gnägi, Werner, von Ipsach, in Dotzigen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gnägi Nellen, Verena, von Ipsach und Naters, in Ipsach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gnägi, Christian, von Ipsach, in Ipsach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jayet-Gnägi, Ruth, von Moudon, in Carrouge VD, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kapeller-Gnägi, Hanna, von Haldenstein, in Ipsach, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Verex Treuhand AG, in Biel BE, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.