Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Ileas AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1998
Deletion from the commercial register
21.09.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Volketswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.020.748-9
UID/VAT
CHE-104.510.111
Sector
Legal counsel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Verwertung von gewerblichen Schutzrechten sowie Einkauf von Food- und Nonfood-Konsumgütern aller Art; Übernahme von Dienstleistungen aller Art im Bereich der Warenbeschaffung; kann Beteiligungen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 05.03.2007 | 20.09.2011 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | <2004 | 04.03.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ileas Ltd in liq
- Ileas SA en liq
- Ileas AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ileas AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6343966, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ileas AG in Liquidation, in Volketswil, CH-020.3.020.748-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 03.09.2009, S. 25, Publ. 5229162). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 5229162, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ileas AG, in Volketswil, CH-020.3.020.748-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 16.02.2009, S. 31, Publ. 4881684).
Firma neu:
Ileas AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Ileas SA en liquidation) (Ileas Ltd in liquidation).
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 09.07.2009 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Elfriede, von Ehrendingen, in Dietlikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scherrer-Walti, Sonja, von Zürich und Dürrenäsch, in Würenlos, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Conrad, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Köln (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Morad-Marquardt, Marion, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4881684, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ileas AG, in Volketswil, CH-020.3.020.748-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 02.04.2008, S. 24, Publ. 4410756).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Strub, Julian, von Mönchaltorf und Meltingen, in Mönchaltorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mattmann, Wolfgang, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in Bichelsee-Balterswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].