Reports for Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG
- Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Ebikon. Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG belongs to the industry «Trading in food products» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 28.03.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.03.2020.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.149.353.
Management (3)
newest board members
Marie Elisabeth Huwiler-Müller,
Markus Huwiler,
Roland Huwiler
newest authorized signatories
Marie Elisabeth Huwiler-Müller,
Markus Huwiler,
Roland Huwiler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.03.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ebikon
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.788.760-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.149.353
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Getränken; Transporte aller Art; Beteiligungen; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004845393, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG, in Ebikon, CHE-114.149.353, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 03.04.2008, S.8, Publ. 4412194).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huwiler, Markus, von Sins, in Ebikon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huwiler-Müller, Marie Elisabeth, genannt Marlis, von Sins, in Ebikon, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Huwiler-Müller, Marie Elisabeth genannt Marlis, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Huwiler, Markus (1986), von Sins, in Ebikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Huwiler, Roland, von Sins, in Ebikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4412194, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Huwiler Getränke + Transporte AG, in Ebikon, CH-100.3.788.760-4, Schlösslistrasse 13, 6030 Ebikon, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
27.03.2008.
Zweck:
Handel mit Getränken;
Transporte aller Art;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.--.
Aktien:
300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Gemäss Sacheinlage- und Sachübernahmevertrag vom 27.03.2008 und Bilanz per 31.12.2007 übernimmt die Gesellschaft von Markus Huwiler, von Sins, in Ebikon, sein Einzelunternehmen Markus Huwiler Getränke + Transporte, in Ebikon (CH-100.1.001.603-4), mit sämtlichen Aktiven (inklusive Guthaben WIR CHF 1'576.55) sowie das Grundstück Nr. 727, GB Ebikon, deren Wert zusammen CHF 1'634'300.50 beträgt und dem gesamten Fremdkapital sowie die auf dem Grundstück lastenden Grundpfandschulden im Gesamtwerte von CHF 1'113'808.99 zum Gesamtpreise von CHF 520'491.51, wofür 300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 220'491.51 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich.
Vinkulierung:
Die Namenaktien sind nach Massgabe der Statuten vinkuliert. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 27.03.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Huwiler, Markus, von Sins, in Ebikon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Huwiler-Müller, Marie Elisabeth genannt Marlis, von Sins, in Ebikon, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.