Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Hôpital de Moutier SA
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.06.2018
Deletion from the commercial register
26.06.2023
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Moutier
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.074.384-7
UID/VAT
CHE-291.901.292
Sector
Operation of hospitals
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société fournit des prestations hospitalières et ambulatoires relevant des soins de base et spécialisés, conformément à la loi sur les soins hospitaliers (LSH) et à la loi sur l'assurance-maladie (LAMal). Elle peut assumer d'autres tâches objectivement proches de son domaine d'activité principal. La société peut créer des succursales, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue ou fusionner avec de telles entreprises, acquérir et aliéner des immeubles, titres, brevets et d'autres droits de protection ainsi que faire toutes les opérations et conclure tous les contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 20.06.2018 | 25.06.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hôpital de Moutier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005777537, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hôpital de Moutier SA, à Moutier, CHE-291.901.292, société anonyme (No. FOSC 40 du 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005687839). Les actifs et les passifs envers les tiers sont repris par la société "Réseau de l'Arc SA", à Saint-Imier (CHE-105.935.631). La société est radiée par suite de fusion.
Publication number: HR02-1005687839, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hôpital de Moutier SA, à Moutier, CHE-291.901.292, société anonyme (No. FOSC 128 du 05.07.2022, Publ. 1005512175).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Eggli, Angelo, de Feuerthalen, à Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Leu, Robert Prof. Dr., de Rohrbachgraben, à Biel-Benken BL (Biel-Benken), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Sartori, Dominique, de Onsernone, à Moutier, directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre du conseil d'administration, directeur, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: HR02-1005512175, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hôpital de Moutier SA, à Moutier, CHE-291.901.292, société anonyme (No. FOSC 216 du 05.11.2021, Publ. 1005327490).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Mérillat, Fabien, de Perrefitte, à Perrefitte, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Belleux, Nicolas, de Morges, à Morges, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
von Overbeck, Jan, de Plaffeien, à St-Prex (Saint-Prex), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.