Reports for Hörmann Oensingen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hörmann Oensingen AG
- Hörmann Oensingen AG in Oensingen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof». Hörmann Oensingen AG is active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 08.01.2020.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SO is CHE-107.975.825.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Martin Hörmann,
Thomas Hörmann,
Marco Christen,
Christoph Hörmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.09.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oensingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-240.3.000.170-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.975.825
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung und Vertrieb von Bauelementen und Zubehörteilen in Stahl, Kunststoff, Aluminium und Holz; kann Grundstücke kaufen und sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 02.07.1999 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hörmann Kestenholz AG
- Hörmann AG.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hörmann Oensingen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004798154, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hörmann Oensingen AG, in Oensingen, CHE-107.975.825, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 03.06.2011, S.0, Publ. 6189672).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen, Rudolf, von Leimiswil, in Oensingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christen, Marco, von Madiswil, in Oberkirch, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6189672, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hörmann Oensingen AG, in Oensingen, CH-240.3.000.170-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2008, S. 21, Publ. 4271202).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Isch, Dr. Ulrich, von Nennigkofen, in Nennigkofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hörmann, Christoph, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bielefeld (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Vizedirektor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in St. Wendel (DE), Vizedirektor mit Einzelunterschrift];
Christen, Rudolf, von Leimiswil, in Oensingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4271202, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hörmann Oensingen AG, in Oensingen, CH-240.3.000.170-2, Herstellung und Vertrieb von Bauelementen usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 06.10.2003, S. 13, Publ. 1201396).
Statutenänderung:
20.12.2007.
Aktien neu:
1'750'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.-- [bisher: 175 Namenaktien zu CHF 10000.--].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.