Reports for Hess Art Holding GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hess Art Holding GmbH
- Hess Art Holding GmbH from Bolligen operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies» and is active.
- The management of the company Hess Art Holding GmbH consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 10.02.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.11.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-223.678.042.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Adesso Real Estate GmbH, Hess Art Collection GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Ostermundigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.069.560-6
UID/VAT
CHE-223.678.042
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb, das Halten, die dauernde Verwaltung, die Veräusserung und die Finanzierung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und andere Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet erscheinen, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder mit diesem direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduco, Fiduciaire pour l'Industrie et le Commerce S.A. | Biel/Bienne | 15.02.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hess Art Holding LLC
- Hess Art Holding Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hess Art Holding GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005880538, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hess Art Holding GmbH, in Bern, CHE-223.678.042, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2023, Publ. 1005826550).
Statutenänderung:
31.10.2023.
Sitz neu:
Ostermundigen.
Domizil neu:
Rörswilstrasse 42, 3065 Bolligen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spuhler, Antonia, von Wislikofen, in Zürich, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baranzelli, Thomas, von Basel, in Basel, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005826550, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hess Art Holding GmbH, in Bern, CHE-223.678.042, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2023, Publ. 1005820824).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Daniel Max, von Zürich, in Lachen SZ (Lachen), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005820824, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hess Art Holding GmbH, in Bern, CHE-223.678.042, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2023, Publ. 1005707199).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Friedli, Georg, von Seeberg, in Burgdorf, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.