Reports for Hauert Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hauert Holding AG
- Hauert Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Grossaffoltern is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Hauert Holding AG is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 23.11.2010.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 26.08.2019. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Hauert Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-116.241.521.
- Next to the company Hauert Holding AG there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Biorga AG, Hauert HBG Dünger AG, Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Hauert HBG Dünger AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grossaffoltern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.049.143-4
UID/VAT
CHE-116.241.521
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung, Vermittlung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen sowie die Durchführung von Finanzgeschäften aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Biel/Bienne | 26.08.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sidus Treuhand AG | Lyss | 29.11.2010 | 25.08.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hauert Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004702153, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert Holding AG, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-116.241.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 11.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2036587).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sidus Treuhand AG (CHE-106.388.482), in Lyss, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-305.494.906), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2036587, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert Holding AG, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-116.241.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2010, S. 3, Publ. 5913540).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sidus Treuhand AG (CHE-106.388.482), in Lyss, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Sidus Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.002.322-1)].
Publication number: 5913540, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert Holding AG, in Grossaffoltern, CH-036.3.049.143-4, Dorfstrasse 12, 3257 Grossaffoltern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
16.11.2010.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung, Vermittlung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen sowie die Durchführung von Finanzgeschäften aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 5'000'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 5'000'000.00.
Aktien:
5'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich, per Telefax oder mit elektronischer Post.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Hauert, Philipp, von Grossaffoltern und Bibern SO, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sidus Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.002.322-1), in Lyss, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.