Reports for Hauert HBG Dünger AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hauert HBG Dünger AG
- Hauert HBG Dünger AG with its legal headquarters in Grossaffoltern is active. Hauert HBG Dünger AG operates in the sector «Production of chemical products».
- Hauert HBG Dünger AG has 6 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.11.2020.
- In the commercial register the company Hauert HBG Dünger AG is registered under the UID CHE-111.737.855.
- At the moment, the company Hauert HBG Dünger AG has 29 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- Companies with the same address as Hauert HBG Dünger AG: Biorga AG, Hauert Holding AG, Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Hauert HBG Dünger AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Stefan Schüpbach,
Peter Hermann Bohnenblust,
Claude Heckly,
Martin Sigrist,
Bernadette Hauert
newest authorized signatories
Stefan Schüpbach,
Peter Hermann Bohnenblust,
Claude Heckly,
Martin Sigrist,
Bernadette Hauert
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grossaffoltern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.015.896-6
UID/VAT
CHE-111.737.855
Sector
Production of chemical products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit Düngern und Hilsstoffen für den Pflanzenbau sowie die Beratung und Forschung auf dem Gebiete des Pflanzenbaues. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, diese erwerben oder pachten, Darlehen aufnehmen und erteilen, Kredite aufnehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Biel/Bienne | 26.08.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sidus Treuhand AG | Lyss | 24.01.2008 | 25.08.2019 | |
Wirtschaftstreuhand Wampfler AG in Liquidation | Lyss | 05.07.2004 | 23.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Biorga Hydroperl | 28.02.2024 | active | 14736/2023 |
Biorga Hydroperl | 06.12.2023 | active | 12286/2023 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Hauert HBG Dünger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005020885, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert HBG Dünger AG, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-111.737.855, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 26.08.2019, Publ. 1004702152).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Arnold, Peter, von Walkringen, in Ittigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauert, Bernadette, von Grossaffoltern und Bibern (SO), in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schüpbach, Stefan, von Mirchel, in Lyss, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004702152, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert HBG Dünger AG, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-111.737.855, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2018, Publ. 4019697).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sidus Treuhand AG (CHE-106.388.482), in Lyss, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-305.494.906), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4019697, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hauert HBG Dünger AG, in Grossaffoltern, CHE-111.737.855, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 11.03.2015, Publ. 2036585).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hauert, Hans-Jürg, von Bibern (SO) und Grossaffoltern, in Grossaffoltern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bohnenblust, Peter, von Wynau, in Ittigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauert, Philipp, von Buchegg und Grossaffoltern, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Bibern (SO) und Grossaffoltern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Heckly, Claude, von Walperswil, in Grandvillard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sigrist, Martin, von Sigriswil, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.