Reports for Gysin Tiefbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gysin Tiefbau AG
- Gysin Tiefbau AG is active in the industry «Building installations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hölstein.
- Gysin Tiefbau AG has 6 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 01.06.2023.
- In the commercial register the company Gysin Tiefbau AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.629.880.
- On the same address there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: ALEVER Immobilien AG, Gysin Group AG, Gysin Immobilien AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Christian Thommen,
David Gysin,
Dr. Catherine Westenberg,
Michael Gysin,
Alex Gysin
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Adrian Schweizer,
Christian Thommen,
David Gysin,
Dr. Catherine Westenberg,
Michael Gysin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.04.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hölstein
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.013.684-3
UID/VAT
CHE-115.629.880
CHE-228.767.983 VAT
Sector
Building installations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Übernahme und Ausführung von Tiefbauarbeiten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmungen beteiligen, solche erwerben oder errichten, Liegenschaften kaufen und verkaufen, gewerbliche Schutzrechte und Know-how erwerben und verwerten, sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Liestal | 03.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gysin Tiefbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005758171, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Tiefbau AG, in Hölstein, CHE-115.629.880, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005688122).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Conconi, Silvio, von Oberdorf BL, in Oberdorf BL, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005688122, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Tiefbau AG, in Hölstein, CHE-115.629.880, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 26.08.2021, Publ. 1005278209).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schweizer, Adrian, von Lampenberg, in Lampenberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-113.952.407), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CH-280.3.011.255-3)].
Publication number: HR02-1005278209, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Tiefbau AG, in Hölstein, CHE-115.629.880, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 03.05.2010, S.6, Publ. 5614858).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gysin, Therese, von Lampenberg, in Lampenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gysin, David, von Lampenberg, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gysin, Michael, von Lampenberg, in Hölstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Thommen, Christian, von Diegten, in Lampenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Westenberg, Catherine, von Birsfelden, in Muttenz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.