Reports for GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG
- GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG is currently active and the industry «Other transportation services». The legal headquarters are in Langenthal.
- GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG was founded on 30.06.2004.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.03.2018.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-111.740.811.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Hertig Ingenieure AG, Huemer + Co. GmbH, SINTAGRO M. Eggen.
Management (7)
newest board members
Jesus Cutberto Parra Mendoza,
Hans Rudolf Küpfer,
Dr. iur. Rudolf Felix Steiner,
Eduard Otto Sigrist
newest authorized signatories
Jesus Cutberto Parra Mendoza,
Bruno Soltermann,
Hans Rudolf Küpfer,
Urs Nützi,
Rolf Kühner
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Langenthal
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.016.894-9
UID/VAT
CHE-111.740.811
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Erwerb und Betrieb sowie Vermietung und Finanzierung von Transport- und Umschlaggeräten aller Art sowie Betrieb von Terminals, Umschlagzentren und anderen festen Einrichtungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte übernehmen oder abgeben, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grevag AG | Langenthal | 21.01.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hans Müller Treuhand | Reinach (BL) | 24.08.2007 | 20.01.2013 | |
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | 06.07.2004 | 23.08.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4142297, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG, in Langenthal, CHE-111.740.811, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2017, Publ. 3684613).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gafner, Rolf, von Beatenberg, in Locarno, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leibundgut, Bruno, von Affoltern im Emmental, in Birsfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Parra Mendoza, Jesus Cutberto, mexikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Mexiko (MX), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3684613, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG, in Langenthal, CHE-111.740.811, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 08.04.2016, Publ. 2767807).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Soltermann, Bruno, von Vechigen, in Ursenbach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2767807, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GLZ Geschäfts- und Logistikzentrum Langenthal AG, in Langenthal, CHE-111.740.811, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 21.01.2013, Publ. 7024796).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gafner, Rolf, von Beatenberg, in Locarno, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Mexiko City (MX), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kühner, Rolf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schopfheim (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rheinfelden (DE)];
Leibundgut, Bruno, von Affoltern im Emmental, in Birsfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grevag AG ( CHE-112.530.452), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Grevag AG];
Küpfer, Hans, von Basel, in Reinach BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.