Reports for Girojet AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Girojet AG
- Girojet AG has its legal headquarters in Horgen and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Technical, physical and chemical testing».
- The company was founded on 26.10.1984 and has 6 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.02.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Girojet AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-111.571.810.
- There are currently 2 trademarks or applications for the company Girojet AG in the IPI database.
- Arn Immobilien AG, CK Carrosserie Caner Kayihan, ck carrosserie GmbH are registered at the same address.
Management (6)
newest board members
Executive board
Kjndrim Sulejmani,
Patrik Kaufmann,
Jeremy Höfliger,
Larissa Kaufmann,
Daniel Weiss
newest authorized signatories
Kjndrim Sulejmani,
Patrik Kaufmann,
Jeremy Höfliger,
Larissa Kaufmann,
Daniel Weiss
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.10.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Horgen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.2.903.760-5
UID/VAT
CHE-111.571.810
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Reinigung von Fussbodenheizungen, Heizkessel- und Heizungssystemen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PEKU Revision AG | Niederglatt | 07.04.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SMART Audit AG | Wallisellen | 03.07.2014 | 06.04.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- D. Weiss AG Wassertechnik
- D. Weiss & Co Wassertechnik
- D. Weiss & Co
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
GIROJET PRO | 03.05.2024 | active | 03781/2024 |
GIROJET | 22.05.2013 | active | 51785/2013 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Girojet AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005968768, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 1922 vom 12.01.2024 Girojet AG, in Horgen, CHE-111.571.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2024, Publ. 1005936108).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höfliger, Jeremy, von Freienbach, in Freienbach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Patrik Kaufmann, nicht mit Sulejmani Kjndrim [nicht: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Kaufmann, Patrik, von Hedingen, in Islisberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Jeremy Höfliger, nicht mit Kjndrim Sulejmani [nicht: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005936108, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Girojet AG, in Horgen, CHE-111.571.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 23.02.2023, Publ. 1005685415).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sulejmani, Krenar, nordmazedonischer Staatsangehöriger, in Reichenburg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Jeremy Höfliger, nicht mit Kaufmann Patrik.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sulejmani, Kjndrim, von Galgenen, in Galgenen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Jeremy Höfliger, nicht mit Patrik Kaufmann;
Kaufmann, Larissa, von Mettmenstetten, in Islisberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Weiss, Larissa];
Höfliger, Jeremy, von Freienbach, in Freienbach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, nicht mit Kaufmann Patrik, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar];
Kaufmann, Patrik, von Hedingen, in Islisberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Höfliger Jeremy, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar].
Publication number: HR02-1005685415, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Girojet AG, in Horgen, CHE-111.571.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2022, Publ. 1005628775).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hänggi, Philippe, von Nunningen, in Zell (ZH), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höfliger, Jeremy, von Freienbach, in Freienbach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, nicht mit Kaufmann Patrik, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, nicht mit Hänggi Philippe, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar];
Kaufmann, Patrik, von Hedingen, in Islisberg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Höfliger Jeremy, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Hänggi Philippe, nicht mit Höfliger Jeremy, nicht mit Sulejmani Krenar];
Sulejmani, Krenar, nordmazedonischer Staatsangehöriger, in Reichenburg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Jeremy Höfliger, nicht mit Kaufmann Patrik [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Hänggi Philippe].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.