Address
c/o KAUFMANN, WUNDERLIN & PARTNER AG
Falknerstrasse 35
4001 Basel
Reports for Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung
- Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung is currently active and the industry «Other social services». The legal headquarters are in Basel.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 09.07.2009.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 01.02.2022.
- The organization's UID is CHE-114.956.810.
- Cäcilienstiftung der Basler Liedertafel, Ernst und Irma Leuthardt-Gronostay-Stiftung, Felix und Béatrice Krauer-Mayer-Stiftung are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.07.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.7.003.026-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.956.810
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt auf gemeinnütziger Basis die Unterstützung von gemeinnützigen Institutionen, Hilfswerken und Hilfsorganisationen und engagiert sich im Bereich der Betreuung von kranken und gebrechlichen Personen. Sie achtet darauf, primär Personen und / oder Projekte zu unterstützen, die auf die Finanzierung angewiesen sind. Die Stiftung kann zur Zweckerreichung Mobilien und Immobilien erwerben, zur Verfügung stellen, mieten und vermiten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 15.07.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005394344, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung, in Basel, CHE-114.956.810, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2021, Publ. 1005290852).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Diem, Georg Otto, von Herisau, in Meggen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wunderlin, Rolf, von Zeiningen, in Zeiningen, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Diem-Schülin, Charlotte Monika, genannt Monique, von Herisau, in Meggen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Diem-Schülin, Charlotte Monika].
Publication number: HR02-1005290852, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung, in Basel, CHE-114.956.810, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 25.05.2020, Publ. 1004895733).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berger, Pascal, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004895733, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Georg u. Monique Diem-Schülin Stiftung, in Basel, CHE-114.956.810, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 254 vom 31.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2573437).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaufmann, Urs, von Mumpf, in Wallbach, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Diem, Georg Otto, von Herisau, in Meggen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.