Reports for Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg
- Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg has its legal headquarters in Hinteregg and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The organization was founded on 15.12.1980.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.11.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg is registered under the UID CHE-104.005.824.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
newest authorized signatories
Rahel Hürzeler,
Christina Friederike Salzmann,
Katharina Scharfenberger,
Armin Köhli,
Verena Koppmeier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.1980
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Egg
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.5.900.697-7
UID/VAT
CHE-104.005.824
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Genossenschaft ist es: ihren Mitgliedern preiswerte Wohnungen anzubieten; die Substanz der Liegenschaft Güetliweg 1, 8132 Hinteregg, zu erhalten. Dafür erlässt sie "Richtlinien für Renovationen und bauliche Veränderungen", die als integraler Bestandteil dieser Statuten gelten; den Betrieb dieser Liegenschaft zu gewährleisten und die Gemeinschaft im Haus zu fördern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005339796, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg, in Egg, CHE-104.005.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 17.09.2019, Publ. 1004717328).
Statutenänderung:
01.07.2021.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Genossenschaft ist es: ihren Mitgliedern preiswerte Wohnungen anzubieten;
die Substanz der Liegenschaft Güetliweg 1, 8132 Hinteregg, zu erhalten. Dafür erlässt sie "Richtlinien für Renovationen und bauliche Veränderungen", die als integraler Bestandteil dieser Statuten gelten;
den Betrieb dieser Liegenschaft zu gewährleisten und die Gemeinschaft im Haus zu fördern.
Anteilscheine neu:
CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: CHF 500.--].
Publication number: HR02-1004717328, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg, in Egg, CHE-104.005.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 02.09.2015, S.0, Publ. 2351393).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jud, Andreas, von Gommiswald, in Egg, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hürzeler, Rahel, von Zürich, in Egg, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Salzmann, Christina Friederike, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Egg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2351393, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Sonne Hinteregg, in Egg, CHE-104.005.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2009, S. 28, Publ. 4923918).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Klaus, Philipp, von Langnau am Albis, in Egg, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Doll, Simone, von Zürich, in Egg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jud, Andreas, von Gommiswald, in Egg, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Rieden, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Köhli, Armin, von Zürich und Kallnach, in Egg, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Aktuar mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Scharfenberger, Katharina, von Kriens, in Egg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuarin mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.