Reports for Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli
- Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli is currently active and the industry «Management of restaurants». The legal headquarters are in Boppelsen.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 16.02.2009.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 17.10.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-114.725.452.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Jean-Paul Stephan Stucki,
Christoph Meier,
Lars Bryner,
Thomas Martin Schiffmann,
Johanna Zürcher Miravent
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Paul Stephan Stucki,
Christoph Meier,
Lars Bryner,
Thomas Martin Schiffmann,
Johanna Zürcher Miravent
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.02.2009
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Boppelsen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.5.000.428-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.725.452
Sector
Management of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli bezweckt die langfristige Sicherung des Betriebes des Restaurant Lägernstübli, namentlich im Hinblick auf dort durchzuführende Aktivitäten ihrer Mitglieder und Anlässe der Bevölkerung von Boppelsen und Umgebung. Sie stellt dazu das Eigenkapital für die notwendigen Investitionen für den Betrieb des Restaurants zur Verfügung. Die Tätigkeit der Genossenschaft ist nicht gewinnstrebig. Die Genossenschaft kann sich an Unternehmen und Organisationen mit gleichen oder ähnlichen Zielsetzungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rägi Treuhand und Immobilien GmbH | Regensdorf | 20.02.2009 | 24.05.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005584156, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli, in Boppelsen, CHE-114.725.452, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 25.05.2018, Publ. 4248389).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Thomas, von Wohlen AG, in Boppelsen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Baur, René, von Basel, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stucki, Jean-Paul Stephan, von Glarus Nord, in Boppelsen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bryner, Lars, von Stäfa, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Christoph, von Zürich, in Otelfingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4248389, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli, in Boppelsen, CHE-114.725.452, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2017, Publ. 3660991).
Statutenänderung:
06.04.2018. Gemäss Erklärung vom 10.04.2018 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stecher, Lorenz, von Scuol, in Boppelsen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, Rechnungsführer der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Koch, Patrick, von Bassersdorf, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rägi Treuhand und Immobilien GmbH (CHE-114.467.965), in Regensdorf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schiffmann, Thomas, von Luzern, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Rechnungsführer der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3660991, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Restaurant Lägernstübli, in Boppelsen, CHE-114.725.452, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 16.06.2015, Publ. 2207941).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zimmermann, Sandra, von Zürich, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zürcher Miravent, Johanna, von Zürich, in Boppelsen, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.