Reports for Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois
- Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois has its legal headquarters in Givisiez and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Other social services».
- The management of the organization Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 12.09.2018.
- The last commercial register change was made on 10.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-329.968.438.
- Companies with the same address as Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois: FribikeSharing SA, Lys Energie SA, Transports publics fribourgeois Holding (TPF) SA.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Nicolas Raymond Jean Rérat,
Serge Collaud,
Olivier Jolissaint
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Raymond Jean Rérat,
Serge Collaud,
Olivier Jolissaint
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.09.2018
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Givisiez
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.567.984-6
UID/VAT
CHE-329.968.438
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Apporter une aide financière temporaire aux membres du personnel d'une des sociétés du groupe TPF qui tombent dans le besoin à la suite d'une maladie prolongée ou d'un accident frappant eux-mêmes ou leurs proches ainsi que pour d'autres motifs les exposant à la gêne; apporter, exceptionnellement, une aide financière temporaire aux pensionnés d'une des sociétés du groupe TPF qui tombent dans le besoin à la suite d'une maladie prolongée ou d'un accident frappant eux-mêmes ou leurs proches ainsi que pour d'autres motifs les exposant à la gêne; apporter une aide financière aux membres du personnel d'une des sociétés du groupe TPF se trouvant dans une précarité financière temporaire découlant de la fondation d'une famille, d'une situation de surendettement, d'une séparation ou d'un divorce, d'une invalidité pas encore prise en charge par les assurances sociales concernées, d'un décès ou d'autres causes comparables; apporter, en cas de décès d'un membre du personnel d'une des sociétés du groupe TPF, une aide financière à ses survivants destinés à participer aux frais d'obsèques; participer financièrement aux activités des sociétés du groupe TPF en lien avec la promotion de la santé et de la sécurité des collaborateurs. La fondation ne poursuit pas de but lucratif ou commercial.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Neuchâtel | 10.11.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Fribourg | 03.09.2019 | 09.11.2023 | |
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | 17.09.2018 | 02.09.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006080682, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois, à Givisiez, CHE-329.968.438 (FOSC du 05.04.2024, p. 0/1006001926).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Rérat Nicolas Raymond Jean, signature collective à deux, maintenant membre du conseil de fondation, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1006001926, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois, à Givisiez, CHE-329.968.438 (FOSC du 10.11.2023, p. 0/1005881999).
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Rérat Nicolas Raymond Jean, de Fahy, à Matran, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005881999, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fonds de secours et de promotion de la santé en faveur du personnel des transports publics fribourgeois, à Givisiez, CHE-329.968.438 (FOSC du 28.04.2022, p. 0/1005460479).
Personnes radiées:
Carrard Jérôme Max Marie, membre du conseil de fondation, vice-président, signature collective à deux;
MAZARS SA (CHE-388.216.322), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA (CHE-291.782.389), à Neuchâtel, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.